Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1739 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15145 Week
» 68161 Month
» 187688 Year
» 3214541 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5107 |
08/10/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
24107 |
26/01/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4610 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
08/10/1960 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
01/12/1976 |
Time in Service |
16 yrs, 1 mth , 23 dys |
Cut Up |
06/1977 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
08/10/1960 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/1967 |
|
Air compressor fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1967 |
|
High level air pipe fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1967 |
|
Water tanks removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1967 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/10/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1967 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
08/10/1960 |
Power Unit VA365 |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
25/11/1961 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
20/11/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
07/11/1964 |
Severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
01/03/1975 |
Eastfield shed visit |
Eastfield |
On shed |
|
Bruce Strong, Facebook |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/10/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5107 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
06/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Air compressor fitted |
|
|
06/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: High level air pipe fitted |
|
|
06/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
06/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Water tanks removed |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24107 |
|
|
06/04/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
27/04/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
23/08/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
01/12/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24107 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|