Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1496 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19299 Week
» 72315 Month
» 191842 Year
» 3218695 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5111 |
26/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
24111 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4610 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
26/11/1960 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
02/02/1976 |
Time in Service |
15 yrs, 2 mths , 7 dys |
Cut Up |
02/1978 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
26/11/1960 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/1967 |
|
Air compressor fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1967 |
|
High level air pipe fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1967 |
|
Water tanks removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1967 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
31/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/11/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1967 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
31/12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
26/11/1960 |
Power Unit VA376 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5111 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
06/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Air compressor fitted |
|
|
06/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: High level air pipe fitted |
|
|
06/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
06/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Water tanks removed |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
31/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24111 |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
27/04/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
28/12/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
29/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
23/08/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
25/10/1975 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
02/02/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24111 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|