Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1038 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19949 Week
» 84903 Month
» 287567 Year
» 3314420 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5113 |
28/01/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
24113 |
07/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4610 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
28/01/1961 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
31/12/1976 |
Time in Service |
15 yrs, 11 mths , 3 dys |
Cut Up |
on 03/10/1977* *Official list from Doncaster Works |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
28/01/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/01/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
28/01/1961 |
Power Unit VA380 |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
25/05/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/01/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5113 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
16/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
04/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
16/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
29/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
03/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
23/02/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
07/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24113 |
|
|
25/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
10/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
31/12/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24113 |
|
|
10/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|