Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3080 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16486 Week
» 69502 Month
» 189029 Year
» 3215882 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5143 |
26/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
24143 |
05/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4610 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
26/11/1960 to Willesden (1A) |
Withdrawn |
31/01/1976 |
Time in Service |
15 yrs, 2 mths , 5 dys |
Cut Up |
05/1976 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
26/11/1960 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/11/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5143 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Willesden (1A) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
17/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
16/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
03/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
01/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24143 |
|
|
10/01/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
31/01/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24143 |
|
|
05/1976 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|