Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 127 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17930 Week
» 70946 Month
» 190473 Year
» 3217326 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5150 |
27/02/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
24150 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4610 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
27/02/1961 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
01/12/1976 |
Time in Service |
15 yrs, 9 mths , 4 dys |
Cut Up |
08/1977 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
27/02/1961 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/02/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/02/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5150 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
28/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
16/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
30/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24150 |
|
|
23/08/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
01/12/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24150 |
|
|
08/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|