Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 160 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17963 Week
» 70979 Month
» 190506 Year
» 3217359 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5150 |
on |
21/02/1930 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
83F |
Truro |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
ALLOC |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/08/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/02/1930 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester West (CHR) |
|
|
21/02/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5150 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
11/01/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester West (CHR) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Abbot (NA) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Truro (83F) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Truro (83F) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
15/08/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5150 |
|
|
12/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|