Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 579 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18382 Week
» 71398 Month
» 190925 Year
» 3217778 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5152 |
01/05/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25002 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
01/05/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/03/1971 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/05/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
09/03/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
01/05/1961 |
Power Unit VA447 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/05/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5152 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Thornaby (51L) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
06/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
18/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
09/03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
04/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25002 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
06/1977 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
06/1977 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
01/12/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25002 from Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
04/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|