Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3187 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16593 Week
» 69609 Month
» 189136 Year
» 3215989 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5156 |
17/06/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25006 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
17/06/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/06/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
06/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
17/06/1961 |
Power Unit VA450 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/06/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5156 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Thornaby (51L) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
16/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
02/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
06/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
18/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
06/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
16/09/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25006 |
|
|
27/04/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
15/02/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
09/08/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Scottish Region (91X) |
|
|
01/12/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25006 from Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
05/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|