Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 834 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18637 Week
» 71653 Month
» 191180 Year
» 3218033 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5160 |
19/08/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25010 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
19/08/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
27/03/1971 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/08/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
27/03/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 12/1974 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
19/08/1961 |
Power Unit VA454 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/08/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5160 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Thornaby (51L) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
27/03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
07/08/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25010 |
|
|
25/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
19/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
09/08/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Scottish Region (91X) |
|
|
11/02/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25010 |
|
|
05/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|