Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1361 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19164 Week
» 72180 Month
» 191707 Year
» 3218560 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5160 |
on |
06/11/1930 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/11/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5160 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stourbridge Junction (STB) |
|
|
08/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester West (84K) |
|
|
09/08/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Blazey (83E) |
|
|
25/11/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5160 from Hereford (85C) |
|
|
21/05/1960 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|