Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 608 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19519 Week
» 84473 Month
» 287137 Year
» 3313990 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5161 |
02/09/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25011 |
10/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
02/09/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
31/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
12/1971 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/09/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
31/12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
12/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
02/09/1961 |
Power Unit VA453 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/09/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5161 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Thornaby (51L) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
31/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
16/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
30/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25011 |
|
|
25/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
15/02/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
07/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
09/08/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Scottish Region (91X) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
01/12/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25011 from Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
03/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|