Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 4256 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17662 Week
» 70678 Month
» 190205 Year
» 3217058 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5162 |
on |
21/11/1930 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
5101 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
259 |
To Service |
Wed 21/11/1930 to Tyseley (TYS) |
Withdrawal |
Wed 16/07/1958 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 7 mths , 25 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
26/05/1949 |
Swindon Stock Shed |
On 26/5, the Stock Shed contained (all stored):-Nos. 2948, 4121/24 (ex Wolverhampton Works), 4168/69, 4914, 5153, 5162 (ex Wolverhampton Works), 5411/17, 5919, 6997-99, 7209, 7900/02/3/4. |
SLS/194907 |
10/08/1949 |
Swindon Stock Shed |
The Stock Shed contained Nos. 1025, 2462, 2948, 4121/68/69, 5153/62, 5411/17, 5563, 5761, 6129/66, 7209. Amongst various engines 'on shed' were Nos. 1503, (marked PDN), 2568 (ex Works), 3820 (ex 4856-oil-burning), 9008/11. |
SLS/194909 |
11/08/1949 |
Swindon Stock Shed |
Stock Shed: The following were noted stored here on 11/8:-Nos. 2948, 4121/68/69, 5153/62, 5411/17, 6129/66 an 7209. Nos. 3015/18 are now ex store and have gone into traffic. |
SLS/194910 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/11/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5162 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
16/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford-on-Avon (GWR) (Tys) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
31/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LDR) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Treherbert (88F) |
|
|
03/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
16/07/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5162 |
|
|
29/11/1958 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|