Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 14 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6860 Week
» 18407 Month
» 418089 Year
» 494676 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5164   11/1930

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 11/1930
Withdrawal During 04/1963
Service Life 32 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84H Wellington 4w/e 21/05/1955
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 08/09/1956
86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 04/11/1961
   Withdrawn m/e 04/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84H Wellington 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 08/09/1956
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 04/11/1961
WDN   4w/e 06/04/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1930 To Service To service as GWR Number 5164
Built at Swindon Works
   
21/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Wellington (84H)    
08/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
04/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
04/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5164    

prev prev