Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4283 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17689 Week
» 70705 Month
» 190232 Year
» 3217085 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5165 |
4w/e |
22/11/1930 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/11/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5165 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
14/12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (STB) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stourbridge Junction (STB) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
10/02/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5165 |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|