Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2081 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15487 Week
» 68503 Month
» 188030 Year
» 3214883 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5168 |
01/12/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25018 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
01/12/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/12/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 12/1974 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
01/12/1961 |
Power Unit VA466 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/12/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5168 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Thornaby (51L) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
15/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
02/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
02/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
07/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
06/11/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25018 |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
01/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
11/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
22/11/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25018 |
|
|
08/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|