Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 4136 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17542 Week
» 70558 Month
» 190085 Year
» 3216938 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5171 |
m/e |
12/1930 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
5101 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
259 |
To Service |
During 12/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 28/07/1958 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 7 mths , 28 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
87G |
Carmarthen |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
86F |
Tondu |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/07/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5171 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
14/12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford-on-Avon (GWR) (Tys) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G) |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tondu (86F) |
|
|
28/07/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5171 |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|