Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 240 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 240 Week
» 34815 Month
» 104294 Year
» 1325859 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5183 m/e 03/1931

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 03/1931
Withdrawal During 05/1962
Scrapping During 09/1962 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 31 yrs, 2 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CDF Cardiff Canton 4w/e 18/05/1946
88F Treherbert 4w/e 31/10/1950
88C Barry 4w/e 08/08/1953
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 08/09/1956
84A Stafford Road 4w/e 22/04/1961
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STJ Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 22/03/1947
ALLOC BRY Barry 4w/e 21/05/1949
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 17/10/1950
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 08/08/1953
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 08/09/1956
ALLOC 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 22/04/1961
WDN   m/e 31/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1931 To Service To service as GWR Number 5183
Built at Swindon Works
   
18/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
31/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
08/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
08/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
22/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A)    
05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5183    
09/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev