Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3012 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16418 Week
» 69434 Month
» 188961 Year
» 3215814 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5185 |
m/e |
03/1931 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
5101 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
259 |
To Service |
During 03/1931 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 15/03/1960 |
Service Life |
29 yrs , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1931 |
LMTN |
|
Leamington |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
83B |
|
Taunton |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
15/03/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LMTN |
Leamington |
4w/e |
29/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
83B |
Taunton |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
15/03/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1931 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5185 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Leamington (LMTN) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Taunton (83B) |
|
|
15/03/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5185 |
|
|
06/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|