Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 33 Online
» 2360 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15766 Week
» 68782 Month
» 188309 Year
» 3215162 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5187 |
m/e |
04/1931 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
5101 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
259 |
To Service |
During 04/1931 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 14/05/1962 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 1 mth , 13 dys |
Information |
Originally scheduled to be withdrawn on 18/1/1960 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1931 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5187 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Leamington (LMTN) |
|
|
31/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A) |
|
|
05/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) |
|
|
14/05/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5187 |
|
|
10/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|