Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2283 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20086 Week
» 73102 Month
» 192629 Year
» 3219482 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5190 |
04/04/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25040 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
12/05/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/04/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
04/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
12/05/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/04/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5190 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
07/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
04/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
12/05/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25040 |
|
|
16/11/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25040 |
|
|
02/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|