Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 106 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2552 Week
» 14257 Month
» 345746 Year
» 422333 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5193   10/1934

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 10/1934
Withdrawal During 06/1962
Service Life 27 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
83F Truro 4w/e 01/11/1952
83E St Blazey 4w/e 08/08/1953
83D Laira 4w/e 06/11/1954
83E St Blazey 4w/e 22/02/1958
83D Laira 4w/e 05/11/1960
87H Neyland 4w/e 03/12/1960
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 83F Truro 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 83E St Blazey 4w/e 08/08/1953
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 83E St Blazey 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 05/11/1960
ALLOC 87H Neyland 4w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction m/e 30/06/1962
WDN   m/e 30/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1934 To Service To service as GWR Number 5193
Built at Swindon Works
   
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Truro (83F)    
08/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to St Blazey (83E)    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
22/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to St Blazey (83E)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Neyland (87H)    
06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5193    

prev prev