Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 3136 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17179 Week
» 82133 Month
» 284797 Year
» 3311650 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5197 |
09/05/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25047 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/05/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
06/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/05/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5197 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
18/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) |
|
|
11/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
09/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
06/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25047 |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
07/08/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
07/09/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25047 |
|
|
09/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|