Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 688 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 688 Week
» 11981 Month
» 276614 Year
» 1498179 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5198 m/e 11/1934

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 284
To Service During 11/1934
Withdrawal Tue 20/06/1961
Scrapping During 11/1961
Service Life 26 yrs, 7 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1934
84D Leamington 4w/e 02/11/1957
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 09/08/1958
81F Oxford 4w/e 29/11/1958
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 24/01/1959
83E St Blazey 4w/e 18/06/1960
83B Taunton 4w/e 31/12/1960
   Withdrawn on 20/06/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TYS Tyseley 4w/e 21/02/1948
ALLOC TYS Tyseley m/e 30/04/1948
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road m/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 83E St Blazey 4w/e 18/06/1960
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 31/12/1960
WDN   m/e 30/06/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1934 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5198
Built at Swindon Works
   
02/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
24/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Blazey (83E)    
31/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
06/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 5198    

prev prev