Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 162 Today
» 1231 Yesterday
» 1393 Week
» 13098 Month
» 344587 Year
» 421174 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5199   11/1934

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 11/1934
Withdrawal During 03/1963
Service Life 28 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84A Stafford Road 4w/e 07/10/1961
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1963
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 09/03/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STB Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 08/10/1949
ALLOC 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 07/10/1961
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 09/03/1963
WDN   4w/e 06/04/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1934 To Service To service as GWR Number 5199
Built at Swindon Works
   
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A)    
03/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5199    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    

prev