Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1635 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15041 Week
» 68057 Month
» 187584 Year
» 3214437 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5200 |
31/05/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25050 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 09/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/05/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
06/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 12/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/05/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5200 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
07/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
28/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
18/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
06/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
09/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25050 |
|
|
22/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KD) |
|
|
01/05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
24/04/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25050 |
|
|
06/04/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|