Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 56 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17859 Week
» 70875 Month
» 190402 Year
» 3217255 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5209 |
m/e |
08/1923 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
223 |
To Service |
During 08/1923 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 21/07/1965 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 11 mths , 20 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/06/1958 |
Pantyffynnon |
Allocation here on 30th June was 4223, 5209, 5223/47, 5703, 7718/76, 8708/45/85. |
SLS/195808 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1923 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5209 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Llanelli (LLY) |
|
|
17/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
31/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
24/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
04/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
21/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5209 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|