Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2278 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20081 Week
» 73097 Month
» 192624 Year
» 3219477 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5211 |
m/e |
09/1923 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
223 |
To Service |
During 09/1923 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 06/05/1964 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 8 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1923 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5211 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Landore (LDR) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) |
|
|
31/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) |
|
|
13/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
31/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdare (88J) |
|
|
06/05/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5211 |
|
|
08/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|