Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 335 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18138 Week
» 71154 Month
» 190681 Year
» 3217534 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5213 |
05/07/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25063 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/07/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
03/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/07/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5213 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
24/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25063 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
10/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
09/10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
11/12/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
02/11/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25063 |
|
|
19/03/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|