Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3491 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16897 Week
» 69913 Month
» 189440 Year
» 3216293 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5214 |
05/07/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25064 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
25 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
05/07/1963 to Toton (18A) |
Withdrawn |
09/12/1985 |
Time in Service |
22 yrs, 5 mths , 4 dys |
Cut Up |
28/02/1987 |
Cut At |
Vic Berry (Leicester) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/07/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/07/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5214 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
24/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25064 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
03/07/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
09/12/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25064 |
|
|
28/02/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|