Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 4457 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 23368 Week
» 88322 Month
» 290986 Year
» 3317839 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5217 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
225 |
To Service |
During 04/1924 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 24/05/1963 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 1 mth , 23 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/11/1945 |
42xx first |
It is believed that the transfer of 4270 an 5217(SLO) to SLO marks the first time that locomotives of this class have been shedded in the London Division, at least for many years. By far the majority have remained in the South Wales area, notable exceptions being the two at St. Blazey. |
SLS/194602 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1924 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5217 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
11/01/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Glyn Neath (nea) |
|
|
03/11/1945 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
24/05/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5217 |
|
|
03/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|