Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1331 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14737 Week
» 67753 Month
» 187280 Year
» 3214133 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5219 |
09/08/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25069 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/08/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
03/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/08/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5219 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25069 |
|
|
14/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
19/12/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25069 |
|
|
30/06/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|