Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1011 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15054 Week
» 80008 Month
» 282672 Year
» 3309525 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5220 |
17/09/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25070 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 07/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/09/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
07/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/09/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5220 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
07/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
07/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25070 |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
14/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
10/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
02/11/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25070 |
|
|
05/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|