Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 804 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18607 Week
» 71623 Month
» 191150 Year
» 3218003 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5224 |
19/07/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25074 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/07/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
03/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
19/07/1963 |
Power Unit VA727 |
|
|
|
19/07/1963 |
Steam Heat Boiler 21179 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/07/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5224 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
22/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
02/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
15/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
03/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25074 |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
07/09/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25074 |
|
|
05/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|