Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 421 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2867 Week
» 14572 Month
» 346061 Year
» 422648 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5224   05/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Churchward
Class 42xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 05/1924
Withdrawal During 04/1963
Service Life 38 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 27/02/1954
88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 24/03/1962
88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 04/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 27/02/1954
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 24/03/1962
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
WDN   4w/e 04/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev