Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 122 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17925 Week
» 70941 Month
» 190468 Year
» 3217321 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5227 |
02/09/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25077 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/09/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
07/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
05/1977 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
05/1977 |
|
EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/09/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
09/09/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
07/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
05/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
02/09/1963 |
Power Unit VA723 |
|
|
|
02/09/1963 |
Steam Heat Boiler 21186 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/09/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5227 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
19/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
07/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
09/09/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
07/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
28/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25077 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
06/09/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
08/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
09/10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
06/05/1978 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25077 |
|
|
09/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|