Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 835 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18638 Week
» 71654 Month
» 191181 Year
» 3218034 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5231 |
14/12/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25081 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
27/08/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/12/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
27/08/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
14/12/1963 |
Power Unit VA774 |
|
|
|
14/12/1963 |
Steam Heat Boiler 21205 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/12/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5231 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
07/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
02/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
27/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
06/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25081 |
|
|
15/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
11/12/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
07/02/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25081 |
|
|
07/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|