Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1853 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19656 Week
» 72672 Month
» 192199 Year
» 3219052 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5232 |
06/11/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25082 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
03/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
12/1971 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
07/1977 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
07/1977 |
|
EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/11/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
05/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
03/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
07/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
06/11/1963 |
Power Unit VA743 |
|
|
|
06/11/1963 |
Steam Heat Boiler 21207 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/11/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5232 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
11/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
02/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
05/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25082 |
|
|
10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
07/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
10/05/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25082 |
|
|
12/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|