Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1035 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14441 Week
» 67457 Month
» 186984 Year
» 3213837 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5232 |
m/e |
07/1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
225 |
To Service |
During 07/1924 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 14/01/1963 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 6 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/10/1961 |
Caerphilly Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: 1420/71, 1506, 1651/68 3702, 4242/65/79/98, 5232, 5618, 6115/45, 6684, 8464/9/86, 9420/57, 9671, 9710, 92221/9. Works Yard: 3682, 3797, 4690, 6108, 9489, 9639, 92238. |
SLS/196112 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1924 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5232 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swansea East Dock (SED) |
|
|
13/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
31/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
14/01/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5232 |
|
|
11/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|