Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1138 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18941 Week
» 71957 Month
» 191484 Year
» 3218337 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5238 |
19/12/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25088 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
19/12/1963 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
01/1972 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
01/1972 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1976 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1976 |
|
EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/12/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
03/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
01/1972 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
11/1976 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/12/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5238 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
05/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
26/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
10/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
03/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
01/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
01/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
10/06/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
11/08/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25088 |
|
|
11/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
16/08/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25088 from Longsight (LO) |
|
|
03/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: at Derby Etches Park |
|
|