Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 288 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18091 Week
» 71107 Month
» 190634 Year
» 3217487 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5239 |
20/12/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25089 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
25 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
20/12/1963 to Toton (16A) |
Withdrawn |
24/02/1986 |
Time in Service |
22 yrs, 2 mths , 4 dys |
Cut Up |
10/1987 |
Cut At |
Vic Berry (Leicester) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
20/12/1963 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 06/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
17/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
05/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
02/1977 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/1977 |
|
EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/12/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
17/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
05/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
02/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/12/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5239 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) |
|
|
26/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
30/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
19/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
17/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25089 |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
02/08/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
02/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
24/02/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25089 |
|
|
10/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|