Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 328 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18131 Week
» 71147 Month
» 190674 Year
» 3217527 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5243 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
225 |
To Service |
During 08/1924 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 27/11/1964 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 3 mths , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1924 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5243 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
13/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hereford (85C) |
|
|
27/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
23/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
16/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
15/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tondu (88H) |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
27/11/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5243 |
|
|
02/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|