Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 2080 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 20991 Week
» 85945 Month
» 288609 Year
» 3315462 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5251 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
233 |
To Service |
During 12/1925 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 15/01/1964 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 1 mth , 16 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
86B |
Newport Pill |
4w/e |
12/01/1963 |
ALLOC |
87F |
Llanelli |
4w/e |
29/06/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
27/01/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5251 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
12/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport Pill (86B) |
|
|
29/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
15/01/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5251 |
|
|
03/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Morriston |
|
|