Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 656 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14062 Week
» 67078 Month
» 186605 Year
» 3213458 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5252 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
233 |
To Service |
During 12/1925 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 07/05/1965 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 5 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5252 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tondu (TDU) |
|
|
19/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86F) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdare (88J) |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
28/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
07/05/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5252 |
|
|
08/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|