|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/01/1962 | Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works | 1017(89A), 1639, 1650, 3200, 3622, 3631, 3831, 4154, 4270(88A), 4555(83A), 4645, 4663, 4946(89A), 5254(87B), 5658, 5957(81F), 6125, 6137, 6326, 6976/9, 7248, 7329, 7439, 8753(81C), 9612/23/46, 82041, 92227(88A). Works Yard: 2287(89C), D3028, D3979. Waiting Works: 3708(86G), 4179(84A), 4608(81C), 6150(81F), 6972(82B), 6992(85A), 75024(84E). | SLS/196203 |
04/03/1962 | Oxley MPD | Ex-Works on 84B: 4270 (88A), 5254 (87B), 7248 (87D), 7439(87G). | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1925 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 5254 Built at Swindon Works |
||
16/11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Glyn Neath (nea) | ||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Neath (Court Sart) (NEA ) | ||
26/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) | ||
29/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) | ||
13/04/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) | ||
24/07/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5254 | ||
12/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |