Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 276 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 276 Week
» 34851 Month
» 104330 Year
» 1325895 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5256 m/e 12/1925
GWR (Rblds) 7221 m/e 12/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 72xx
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
520512/1925
720009/1935
Wheels 2-8-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 12/1925
Withdrawal During 11/1964
Scrapping During 04/1965
Service Life 38 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry 4w/e 06/10/1962
2D Banbury w/e 07/12/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 30/11/1963
ALLOC 2D Banbury 4w/e 07/12/1963
WDN   w/e 28/11/1964
ALLOC 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 2w/e 07/03/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev