Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 447 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1832 Week
» 8637 Month
» 115583 Year
» 1337148 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5258 m/e 01/1926
GWR (Rblds) 7223 m/e 01/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 42xx
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
520501/1926
720010/1935
Wheels 2-8-0T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 01/1926
Withdrawal During 11/1964
Scrapping During 01/1965
Service Life 38 yrs , 10 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
136 Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 01/12/1945
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 04/11/1961
88C Barry 4w/e 27/07/1963
87F Llanelly 4w/e 30/11/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STJ Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 01/12/1945
ALLOC LDR Landore 4w/e 09/08/1947
TOSTORE   4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 27/07/1963
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 30/11/1963
WDN   2w/e 28/11/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev