Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 4274 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17680 Week
» 70696 Month
» 190223 Year
» 3217076 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5262 |
m/e |
03/1926 |
Great Western Railway (Rblds) |
7227 |
on |
27/11/1935 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
233 |
To Service |
During 03/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 24/06/1963 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 3 mths , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1926 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5262 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
27/11/1935 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7227 |
|
|
14/12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (BAN) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Oxley (OXY) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
19/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
01/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
29/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
27/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
13/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
24/06/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7227 |
|
|
05/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|