Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 125 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 2264 Week
» 12434 Month
» 290230 Year
» 1174611 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5264 m/e 03/1926
GWR (Rblds) 7229 m/e 03/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 72xx
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
520503/1926
720008/1935
Wheels 2-8-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 03/1926
Withdrawal During 08/1964
Service Life 38 yrs, 5 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 27/03/1954
87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 24/02/1962
87A Neath (Court Sart) 6w/e 13/04/1964
86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 7w/e 22/06/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 27/03/1954
ALLOC 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 24/02/1962
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 5w/e 30/03/1964
ALLOC 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 3w/e 29/06/1964
WDN   3w/e 10/08/1964
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev