Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 448 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1833 Week
» 8638 Month
» 115584 Year
» 1337149 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5265 m/e 03/1926
GWR (Rblds) 7230 m/e 03/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 42xx
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
520503/1926
720012/1935
Wheels 2-8-0T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 03/1926
Withdrawal During 07/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964
Service Life 38 yrs, 4 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry 4w/e 28/01/1956
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 21/02/1959
87E Landore 4w/e 21/03/1959
84J Croes Newydd 4w/e 27/02/1960
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STJ Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 21/05/1949
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 28/01/1956
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 87E Landore 4w/e 21/03/1959
ALLOC 84J Croes Newydd 4w/e 27/02/1960
WDN   w/e 08/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev