Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 32 Online
» 2762 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16168 Week
» 69184 Month
» 188711 Year
» 3215564 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5266 |
m/e |
03/1926 |
Great Western Railway (Rblds) |
7231 |
on |
23/12/1935 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
233 |
To Service |
During 03/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 09/10/1964 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88C |
Barry |
4w/e |
06/10/1962 |
ALLOC |
88B |
Radyr |
4w/e |
29/06/1963 |
ALLOC |
87F |
Llanelli |
4w/e |
27/07/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
3w/e |
05/10/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1926 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5266 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
23/12/1935 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7231 |
|
|
11/01/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (STJ) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
06/10/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
29/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88B) |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
09/10/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7231 |
|
|
02/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|